pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland Foundation
CC44688
9429043212293
Registered

Registration details

18/07/2010
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Auckland Communities Foundation 19/07/2010
Auckland Foundation 28/02/2017

Address for service

PO Box 139
Shortland Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1140
Level 26, 188 Quay Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Auckland Foundation (AF) is here to make Auckland a better place by helping generous people build a permanent pool of funds to support the causes of today and tomorrow.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Community development

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The Board of Trustees is represented by: Joy Marslin (Chair) Ian Short (Deputy Chair) Ken Whitney Suneil Connor Melanie Hewitson Kenneth Leong Amokura Panaho Doug Hanna Qiujing Wong

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

Charity has been granted an extension to file 2016 annual return to 30 November 2016. Documents filed under Letters.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 27/09/2019 $3,658,493 $1,591,774
31/10/2018 29/10/2018 $1,618,588 $1,490,183
30/09/2017 26/10/2017 $2,172,441 $1,617,219
30/09/2016 2/12/2016 $3,909,674 $1,712,379
30/09/2015 28/09/2015 $1,536,122 $1,379,972
30/09/2014 29/09/2014 $1,476,983 $1,197,586
30/09/2013 26/09/2013 $914,414 $915,435
30/09/2012 3/12/2012 $544,481 $54,424
30/09/2011 31/10/2011 $199,830 $9,927

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Qiujing Wong Trustee 2/10/2019
Douglas Hanna Trustee 25/09/2017
Ian Short Deputy Chair 25/09/2017
Kenneth Whitney Trustee 25/09/2017
Amokura Panoho Trustee 1/06/2016
Suneil Connor Trustee 1/06/2016
Joy Marslin Chair 4/12/2015
Mel Hewitson Trustee 21/08/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alison Joy Sutton Trustee 31/12/2019
Geoffrey Clews Trustee 31/12/2018
Shaun Adams Trustee 25/09/2017
Simon Tran Trustee 29/05/2017
Peter Elderkin Trustee 1/05/2017
Marion Jane Webster Trustee 23/01/2017
Kirk Vaughan Sargent Trustee 30/05/2016
Ingrid Merhyl Waugh Trustee 19/10/2015
Philippa Anne King Trustee 5/06/2015
Clare de Lore Trustee 15/03/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/01/2020 NOC045
29/05/2019 NOC043
31/10/2017 NOC041
20/09/2017 NOC039
11/07/2017 NOC038
17/05/2017 NOC037
20/04/2017 NOC035
8/03/2017 NOC032
2/03/2017 NOC031
24/01/2017 NOC030

Charity Documents