pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Night Shelter Trust
Wellington Night Shelter
CC11011
9429042936442
Registered

Registration details

3/09/2007
March 31

Address for service

304 Taranaki Street
Mount Cook
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04)3859546
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/WNShelter/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide emergency and transitional accommodation for men experiencing homelessness and to support them in their recovery and to be a part of a group of Wellington based organisations committed to preventing and ending homelessness.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Accommodation / housing

Other (please state)

(Homeless Men over the age of 18)

Entity Structure

Board compromising of 5 to 8 members, plus a Treasurer, with a General Manager reporting to the Board. Main sources of income are grants, donations and accommodation fees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2019 22/07/2019 $1,101,183 $992,338
30/09/2018 26/09/2018 $757,272 $734,340
30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $525,968 $541,925
30/09/2016 6/11/2016 $355,876 $445,428
30/09/2015 4/11/2015 $303,824 $470,824
30/09/2014 18/09/2014 $307,091 $487,670
30/09/2013 24/01/2014 $305,016 $371,163
30/09/2012 5/09/2012 $376,534 $310,122
30/09/2011 3/11/2011 $287,566 $298,483

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Maria Celeste Millin Trustee 11/12/2019
Donna Isobell Mitchell Trustee 2/12/2019
Christopher James Graham Trustee 1/04/2019
Keith Tyson Trustee 17/08/2018
Lesley Bernadette Hooper Trustee 17/03/2017
Claire Booth Trustee 27/11/2015
John Kennedy-Good Chair 2/02/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Charles Tobias Beaglehole Trustee 1/05/2020
Murray Edridge Trustee 2/12/2019
Greg Hawkins Trustee 31/08/2018
Ron Daly Trustee 17/07/2018
Patricia Ann Malcolm Trustee 8/06/2018
Hilary Hague Trustee 3/04/2018
Lee Edney Trustee 11/03/2017
Kevin McCormack Trustee 1/02/2017
Christopher James Graham Trustee 16/12/2016
David Patrick Mullin Trustee 27/11/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/05/2020 NOC030
4/02/2020 NOC029
28/01/2020 NOC028
28/01/2020 NOC027
26/03/2019 NOC024
18/09/2018 NOC022
18/09/2018 NOC021
18/09/2018 NOC020
10/09/2018 NOC019
22/02/2018 NOC018

Charity Documents