pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Circuit International
Circuit
CC22908
9429043311897
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Partners Relief and Development NZ 14/04/2008
Circuit International 10/04/2016

Registration details

13/04/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 40284
Upper Hutt
5140
40 The Parade
Island Bay
Wellington
6023

Charity's other details

0223723116
Facebook icon image
facebook.com/circuitinternational/
https://www.instagram.com/circuitinternational/

Asia

Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, Thailand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

WSe are a faith-based international development organisation. Our mission is: Connecting People, through Business, with Justice, enabling Sustainable Development

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

International activities

Education / training / research, Emergency / disaster relief

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

A Board of up 7 trustees, which includes a development specialist, a business specialist, a pastoral care specialist, and an ethnic representative. Management: Executive Director, and Field Programmes Manager both based in NZ since June 2015 (formerly based in Thailand) and local field project managers (based in Myanmar).

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 25/09/2018 $419,729 $283,511
30/09/2017 26/09/2017 $425,089 $296,579
30/09/2016 1/10/2016 $429,284 $455,206
30/09/2015 22/08/2015 $582,571 $572,879
30/09/2014 5/06/2014 $559,045 $529,306
30/09/2013 20/08/2013 $700,047 $720,314
30/09/2012 18/08/2012 $428,958 $465,426
30/09/2011 12/08/2011 $509,683 $490,586
30/09/2010 29/09/2010 $289,284 $246,794
30/09/2009 22/07/2009 $25,285 $21,952

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
July Seng Lahpai Trustee 12/07/2018
Robert Gordon Pritchard Trustee 10/05/2018
Brian Robert Patchett Trustee 21/04/2016
Graeme Taylor Chairman 12/02/2015
Sharon Bell Trustee 11/03/2014
Ruth Grace Gribble Corlett Trustee 20/11/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hnin Pwint Soe Trustee 12/07/2018
James Molony Trustee 13/07/2017
Joseph Erskine Holmes Trustee 3/03/2017
Reuben Olson Trustee 21/04/2016
Ruben Olsen Trustee 21/04/2016
Joseph Eric Holmes Trustee 9/03/2016
Rebekah Silver Trustee 18/08/2015
Phillip Larking Trustee 28/02/2015
Wendy Laura Molony Trustee 17/07/2014
Reuben Olson Trustee 15/05/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/07/2013 NOC009
22/11/2011 NOC008
21/10/2011 NOC007
12/08/2011 AR004
20/07/2011 NOC006
31/05/2011 NOC005
24/05/2011 NOC004
22/07/2009 AR002
19/03/2009 NOC003
23/09/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents