pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Lifewise Trust
Lifewise
CC40248
Registered

Registration details

20/05/2009
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 5104
Wellesley Street
Auckland
1141
LEVEL 7. UNIVERSITY OF OTAGO BUILDING
385 Queen Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

09 302 8169
09 302 5393


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide the following services: health and disability, family and children; crisis response and housing; early childhood education; community and neighbourhood development and; mental health and addiction

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities, Homeless Day Centre

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development, Religious activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Homeless Support

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Registered Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 1/12/2017 $12,892,000 $12,941,000
31/12/2016 7/04/2017 $11,678,000 $11,957,000
31/12/2015 28/01/2016 $12,238,000 $12,050,000
31/12/2014 17/12/2014 $12,314,000 $12,147,000
31/12/2013 15/11/2013 $11,642,000 $11,633,000
31/12/2012 22/11/2012 $12,925,000 $12,691,000
31/12/2011 9/12/2011 $10,970,000 $10,530,000
31/12/2010 22/11/2010 $9,437,000 $9,432,000
31/12/2009 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rohan Benjamin Cawley Trustee 6/10/2016
Rx Francis Nathan Trustee 6/10/2016
Tayyaba Akram Loane Trustee 6/10/2016
William John MacDonald Trustee 24/02/2016
Apaula Julia Loane Trustee 15/02/2016
Mark Gosche Trustee 2/03/2015
Peter Glensor Trustee 16/09/2014
Katherine Ravenswood Trustee 30/05/2013
Marion Lesley Hines Trustee 21/05/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sao Timaloa Trustee 1/07/2017
John Stanley Murray Superintendent/ Trustee 31/12/2015
Keith Russell Hopner Trustee 30/11/2015
Nicola Anne Grundy Trustee 24/06/2015
Ross Selwyn Taylor Trustee 15/06/2015
Prince Devanandan Trustee 2/03/2015
Gardenia Atimalala-taulealeausumai Trustee 23/04/2013
Kalolo Fihaki TRUSTEE 31/01/2012
Seini Filiai Trustee 31/12/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/08/2015 NOC012
29/06/2015 NOC011
26/06/2015 NOC010
27/06/2013 NOC007
26/06/2013 NOC006
22/11/2012 AR004
20/02/2012 NOC005
24/03/2010 NOC004
23/03/2010 NOC003
8/12/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents