pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Idea Services Limited
CC22489
9429037016166
Registered

Registration details

2/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

c/- Duncan Cotterill
PO Box 10376
The Terrace
Wellington
6143
c/- Duncan Cotterill, Level 2
50 Customhouse Quay
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04) 472 2247
(04) 472 0429


Group Members


Below are all the members of IHC New Zealand. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Accessible Properties New Zealand Limited
Choices New Zealand Limited
Idea Services Limited
IHC New Zealand Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The charitable objects of IHC New Zealand Incorporated generally, and in particular to establish and maintain vocational, residential, recreational and community services for persons with an intellectual disability and their families.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

People with disabilities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Employment, Promotion of volunteering, Vocational, Family support

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau, Adults

Entity Structure

NZ limited company which is a wholly owned subsidiary of IHC New Zealand Incorporated

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 20/12/2016 $280,336,000 $280,090,000
31/12/2015 11/12/2015 $272,925,000 $267,269,000
31/12/2014 27/01/2015 $266,309,000 $259,863,000
31/12/2013 9/01/2014 $248,780,000 $249,826,000
31/12/2012 11/01/2013 $262,826,000 $119,140,000
31/12/2011 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony John Shaw Director 31/10/2019
Barbara Joan Rocco Director 31/10/2019
Lynne Marie Lane Director 31/10/2019
Michael Francis Quigg Director 31/10/2019
Pauline Alice Winter Director 31/10/2019
Susanne Kay Win Director 31/10/2019
Neil Alexander Taylor Director 13/09/2018
Ralph Jones Chief Executive 3/04/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Shelley Payne Director 7/09/2018
Donald Thompson National President 7/09/2017
Lynne Renouf Vice President 12/07/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/09/2018 NOC011
12/09/2018 NOC010
14/09/2017 NOC008
13/09/2017 NOC007
20/12/2016 NOC005
10/08/2016 NOC004
10/08/2016 NOC003
10/01/2013 AR003
12/01/2010 AR002

Charity Documents