pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Essentially Men Education Trust
Essentially Men
CC34239
9429043124176
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 68311
Wellesley Street
Auckland
1141
13 Maidstone Street
Grey Lynn
Auckland
1021

Charity's other details

09 376 2386
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/MenBeingReal/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To enhance the health and well-being of society by focusing on positive ways of being for men and boys, through promoting educational programmes, public awareness, leadership, community development and research.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Health, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Education / Social Service

Other (please state)

(Men And Boys), Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Trust Structure The Trust Deed states that we must have no more than nine (9) and no less than five (5) Trustees. These Trustees oversee the vision, governance and management of the Trust. Operational Structure The Trust employees two (2) full time employees responsible for : 1. Marketing, Sales and Programme provisioning 2. Finance, Funding, Administration and Database management.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 - - - - To be filed
30/11/2019 22/11/2019 $195,346 $169,028
30/11/2018 3/12/2018 $271,871 $248,006
30/09/2017 5/10/2017 $233,394 $228,231
30/09/2016 20/11/2016 $254,213 $230,902
30/09/2015 5/04/2016 $213,376 $219,728
30/09/2014 29/09/2014 $280,793 $256,018
30/09/2013 30/09/2013 $325,418 $376,990
30/09/2012 29/10/2012 $353,273 $385,697
30/09/2011 10/10/2011 $350,493 $373,486

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dennis Michael Wickstead Trustee 24/10/2019
Barry John Vautier Trustee 24/05/2019
Richard Aplin Trustee 11/04/2019
Andrew Yelverton Trustee 16/08/2018
Paul Watson Chairperson 24/05/2018
Phillip Rice Trustee 20/04/2017
Greg Newman-Watt Trustee 23/04/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Luke Sniewski Trustee 11/10/2019
Ocean Paul Numan Trustee 24/05/2019
Eric Ryda Trustee 21/03/2019
Dick Postel Trustee 13/12/2018
Terence Gordon Greenslade Chairman 13/12/2018
Andrew Shaw Trustee 16/11/2017
Ian Drower Trustee 19/10/2017
Paul Watson Trustee 20/01/2017
Cyril Wright Trustee 15/12/2016
David James Peter Passell Trustee 15/12/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/09/2019 NOC016
5/09/2017 NOC013
25/05/2017 NOC012
21/11/2016 NOC011
30/06/2016 NOC009
17/09/2015 NOC008
29/09/2014 NOC007
10/07/2013 NOC002
12/04/2013 NOC001
28/09/2012 AR005

Charity Documents