pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The White Ribbon Campaign Trust Board
CC49471
Registered

Registration details

1/08/2013
June 30

Address for service

81 Otaihanga Road
Otaihanga
Paraparaumu
5036

Charity's other details

0272440374


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To reduce men's violence towards Women

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides education to promote public safety

Social services

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
28/02/2018 3/02/2018 $731,434 $541,008
31/12/2016 19/05/2017 $514,755 $447,451
31/12/2015 8/11/2015 $350,953 $322,280
30/09/2014 29/09/2014 $442 $0
30/09/2013 29/08/2013 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Cam Ronald Trustee 1/02/2017
Jackie Adams Trustee 1/02/2017
Richie Hardcore Trustee 1/02/2017
Saty Candasamy Trustee 1/02/2017
Aaron Morrison Trustee 18/06/2013
Mark Longley Trustee 18/06/2013
Ric Odom Trustee 18/06/2013
Takurua Tawera Trustee 18/06/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alana Bowman Trustee 31/01/2017
Heather Henare Trustee 31/01/2017
David White Trustee 20/06/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/11/2017 NOC006
23/05/2017 NOC005
29/11/2016 NOC003
30/09/2014 NOC002
25/06/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents