pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Asexuality New Zealand Trust Board
CC55644
9429046720184
Deregistered
03/01/2020

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$5
$0

The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:


Below are details of Asexuality New Zealand Trust Board at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

21/04/2018
March 31
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 3/01/2020 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 21/04/2018

Address for service

Flat 3
35 Belmont Terrace
Remuera
Auckland
1050

Charity's other details

0210439862
Facebook icon image
@acenztrust
Twitter icon image
@AceNZTrust


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust intends to advance education and provide benefit to the community at large by producing, collating, and disseminating to the community at large educational material related to the nature of the asexual spectrum, the experiences of asexual individuals, the effective provision of mental health, medical, and public services in order to improve the psychological well-being of asexual spectrum individuals (who comprise approximately 1% of the population), and promote harmony and tolerance.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

The Trust and its trust property is controlled and held on trust by a Board of Trustees, currently comprised of 3 members. The Deed states that there must be between 2 and 5 members. We are presently mainly active in Auckland, but intend to expand to operate nationally. The deed provides for the board to elect a chairperson from amongst its members each year, and for secretarial duties to rotate between other members. Our policies provide for a treasurer to oversee finances.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $144 $142

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ellen Alice Williamson Member, and Chair, of Board of Trustees 5/04/2018
Natasha Elizabeth McKean Member of Board of Trustees and Treasurer 5/04/2018
Sebastian Thomas Hartley Member of, and Secretary to, Board of Trustees 5/04/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/01/2020 NOC002

Charity Documents