pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Age Concern Otago Incorporated
CC21566
9429042576259
Registered

Registration details

4/03/2008
November 30

Address for service

AGE CONCERN OTAGO PO Box 5355
Moray Place
Dunedin
9058
AGE CONCERN OTAGO
26 Bath Street
Dunedin
9058

Charity's other details

(03)4771040
(03)4771040


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Promoting wellbeing rights and dignity for Otago's older people

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Health, Community development, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering, Promoting the wellbeing of Otago's older people

Older people

Entity Structure

An incorporated Society

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Otago Third Age Trust CC31774

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/05/2019 28/05/2019 $848,457 $686,666
31/05/2018 8/02/2019 $884,899 $784,968
31/05/2017 10/07/2017 $766,907 $759,267
31/05/2016 29/06/2016 $911,796 $921,191
31/05/2015 13/05/2015 $881,080 $901,077
31/05/2014 29/04/2014 $783,456 $854,438
31/05/2013 17/04/2013 $858,034 $910,429
31/05/2012 14/05/2012 $874,728 $837,786
31/05/2011 21/06/2011 $834,208 $796,237
31/05/2010 31/05/2010 $785,000 $768,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Diane Cooper Committee Member 21/03/2017
Marie Faufisa DCC Co-opted Member 21/03/2017
Linda Robertson Executive Member 21/06/2011
Robert Aitken Committee member 23/03/2010
Russell Melville Treasurer 5/03/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Brian McMahon Individual 21/03/2017
Geoffrey Thomas Board Member 21/03/2017
Gill Barbazet Executive Member 21/03/2017
Rosemarie Patterson Individual 21/03/2017
Dunedin City Council co-opted Executive Member 1/12/2016
Susan Davidson Executive Officer 30/11/2016
Ann MacGregor Deputy Chairperson 26/03/2013
Shirley Ungemuth Chairperson 26/03/2013
Stanley Rodger Member 26/03/2013
James Stanley Rodger Executive member 30/11/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/04/2014 NOC006
16/04/2013 AR006
14/05/2012 AR005
21/06/2011 AR004
31/05/2010 AR003
5/05/2009 AR002

Charity Documents