pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Cure Our Ovarian Cancer (Low Grade Serous) Charitable Trust
Cure Our Ovarian Cancer, Ovarian Cancer NZ
CC55925
9429046845467
Registered

Registration details

31/07/2018
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Cure My Ovarian Cancer (Low Grade Serous) Charitable Trust 14/11/2018
Cure Our Ovarian Cancer (Low Grade Serous) Charitable Trust 5/12/2018

Address for service

PO Box 143
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9054
Gallaway Cook Allan
Level 2, 123 Vogel Street
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
facebook.com/cureourovariancancer
Twitter icon image
twitter.com/cure_ovarian_ca

Oceania

Australia

North America

Canada, United States

Europe

France, Germany, Netherlands, Spain, United Kingdom


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Encourage research into low grade serous ovarian cancer by directly funding research and encouraging and assisting other charities and/or organisations to fund research. Raise awareness of low grade serous ovarian cancer. Improve the standard of care received by women with low grade serous ovarian cancer in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Fund-raising

Health

Other charities

General public

Entity Structure

The Trust operates from Dunedin. The Trust Deed states that there must be between two and five trustees. The Trust currently has two trustees that constitute the governance board.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/10/2020 2/11/2020 $160,759 $106,499
31/10/2019 31/10/2019 $88,493 $3,479

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Elspeth Joan Ludemann Trustee 31/05/2018
Jane Mary Ludemann Trustee 31/05/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/07/2021 NOC006
8/08/2019 NOC003
19/11/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents