pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hukanui Bible Church
CC24294
N/A
Registered

Registration details

12/05/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12063
Chartwell Square
Hamilton
3248
54 Hukanui Road
Chartwell
HAMILTON
3210

Charity's other details

07 855 8628


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Providing Christian teaching and charitable activities in the surrounding suburb.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, International activities, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Religious groups, The Church Congregation

Entity Structure

Church Elders and congregation.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 20/09/2018 $175,294 $115,761
30/09/2017 23/09/2017 $159,237 $116,578
30/09/2016 23/10/2016 $225,518 $148,416
30/09/2015 20/10/2015 $98,067 $90,455
30/09/2014 21/10/2014 $99,757 $59,024
30/09/2013 23/10/2013 $0 $0
30/09/2012 12/09/2012 $76,669 $77,098
30/09/2011 13/07/2011 $0 $0
30/09/2010 5/08/2010 $155,735 $143,616
30/09/2009 2/07/2009 $204,097 $100,679

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Arthur Ross Williamson Elder 3/02/2008
Ernest Keith Brown Property Manager 3/02/2008
Peter Sun Elder 3/02/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Donald Paul Randall Deacon 31/07/2016
Stuart James Emmett Elder 31/07/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/03/2017 NOC005
13/07/2011 AR004
2/07/2009 AR002

Charity Documents