pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of J R McKenzie Trust Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Jayar Charitable Trust
The J R McKenzie Trust

Group Details


J R McKenzie Trust Group

Registration details

Registered
26/01/2017
CC54094
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 10006
The Terrace
Wellington
6143
116 Lambton Quay
114 Lambton Quay
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Group's other details

(04)4728876
(04)4725367


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 27/09/2018 $6,518,000 $6,507,000
30/09/2017 30/10/2017 $6,570,000 $4,882,000

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To contribute to a socially just and inclusive Aotearoa New Zealand, mainly by making grants to community organisations.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Employment, Economic development, Disability, Promotion of volunteering

Other charities

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Children / young people

Entity Structure

The J R McKenzie Trust makes grants and operates some programmes. The Jayar Charitable Trust oversees an investment portfolio, whose earnings are available for JRMT to distribute. Jayar Trustees are appointed by the JRMT Board.

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents