pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Mobility Assistance Dogs Trust
Mobility Dogs
CC24410
Registered

Registration details

14/05/2008
March 31

Address for service

P.O. Box 84-031 Westgate
Henderson
Auckland
0657
Unit C, 13-15 Collard Place
Henderson
Auckland
0610

Charity's other details

09 8366238


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To enhance the lives of people living with physical disabilities, increasing independence, confidence, self-esteem and participation in New Zealand communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides trained service dogs to individuals living with physical disabilities.)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Disability Service Provider

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people

Entity Structure

The Trust comprises a board of 7 Trustees who oversee the governance of the Trust, a General Manager who is responsible for the day-to-day operations of the Trust and reporting to the Trustees, and two full-time and two part-time staff who support the General Manager in delivering against the Trust's objectives.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/10/2018 24/10/2018 $757,087 $625,359
30/09/2017 24/09/2017 $538,198 $534,339
30/09/2016 29/11/2016 $527,963 $413,499
30/09/2015 21/11/2015 $751,212 $402,674
30/09/2014 4/12/2014 $288,952 $399,717
30/09/2013 29/09/2013 $435,622 $440,695
30/09/2012 11/12/2012 $408,802 $412,271
30/09/2011 4/10/2011 $477,055 $470,550
30/09/2010 29/09/2010 $571,500 $531,100
30/09/2009 19/10/2009 $281,530 $297,600

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
suzanne crowther Chair 3/07/2017
Troy Kennedy Trustee 1/04/2016
Emma clarke Trustee 1/03/2013
Karen Elliott Trustee 1/11/2012
Katherine Erika Peake Trustee 6/10/2010
Gregory John Shanahan Trustee 1/10/2009
Suzanne Pita Mudge Trustee 12/10/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Buchanan Peebles Trustee 12/06/2017
Suzanne Marie Crowther Trustee 1/04/2016
Peter Smith Trustee 2/02/2012
Grant John Hunter Trustee/Secretary 1/10/2010
Barry De Geest Trustee 31/08/2010
Margaret Anne Zubcic Trustee/Chairperson 31/03/2009
Blair Donald Smith Trustee/Treasurer 31/03/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/08/2017 NOC013
22/08/2017 NOC012
29/08/2016 NOC010
29/08/2016 NOC009
7/12/2015 NOC006
16/04/2014 NOC005
29/09/2013 AR006
4/10/2011 AR004
29/09/2010 AR003
19/10/2009 AR002

Charity Documents