pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Brain Injury Association (Otago) Incorporated
CC32059
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 5222
Moray Place
Dunedin
9058
COMMUNITY HOUSE
283 Moray Place
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

03-471-6156
03-471-6174
Facebook icon image
Brain Injury Otago


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To support, advocacy and education in order to promote quality of life that maximizes potential, choice and independence for people affected by brain injury. BIA Otago provides and ongoing link for those with brain injury in the community as they struggle to rebuild their lives after brain injury.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides Liaison

Health

Education / training / research, Social services, Sport / recreation, People with disabilities, Support and Liaison

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

We offer a free service to anyone in Otago affected by brain injury. This includes individuals and their families. Our Liaison Service is supported by a Liaison Officer and Fundraiser/Administrator. The Liaison Officer spends two full days per week in Central Otago and the majority of time in our office in Community House. They also travel to other areas of Otago. BIA Otago is governed by a Board and has members who pay an annual subscription. There are approximately 450 clients in Otago

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 31/05/2018 $93,853 $100,188
30/09/2017 6/11/2017 $100,901 $85,839
30/09/2016 31/05/2016 $99,411 $82,818
30/09/2015 27/08/2015 $81,078 $78,722
30/09/2014 5/09/2014 $82,696 $80,709
30/09/2013 4/09/2013 $84,768 $79,151
30/09/2012 6/08/2012 $81,631 $81,393
30/09/2011 11/07/2011 $99,281 $94,253
30/09/2010 11/10/2010 $64,359 $87,031
30/09/2009 2/09/2009 $83,419 $90,513

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrea Carol Vaughan Fundraiser/Administrator 15/10/2014
Christopher Paul Williams Committee Member 26/05/2009
Cathy Matthews Committee Member 26/05/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Beverley Livingstone Committee Member 29/05/2018
Rose Finch Committee Member 29/05/2018
Kathryn Joy Duncan Secretary/Treasurer 31/10/2014
Grant Williams Committee Member 19/06/2014
Helen Susan Reynolds Committee Member 19/06/2014
Denise Cameron Committee member 19/06/2013
Mary Butler Committee Member 19/06/2013
Victoria Morne Pearce Committee Member 8/01/2013
Annette Osborne Committee Member 28/05/2012
Frazer Clark Spence Committee Member 28/05/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/07/2016 NOC007
5/08/2013 AR006
6/08/2012 AR005
11/07/2011 AR004
11/10/2010 AR003
2/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents