pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Piringa Charitable Trust
Piringa
CC43960
9429043189274
Registered

Registration details

8/04/2010
March 31

Address for service

575A Mahurangi East Road
Algies Bay
Warkworth
0920

Charity's other details

09 4256394


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Inspired by christian values, Piringa's mission is to provide a safe place and space for clients in transition to intentionally reflect and process the past in order to grow emotionally, mentally and spiritually, so to enable them to move forward into the future in health ways. ('Debriefing')

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(People in Transition), Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, General public, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Piringa is governed by an elected Trust Board of up to seven Trustees, which includes a Chair and Secretary. There is a volunteer Trust Treasurer who reports to the Trust Board. The Trust Board meets at least 3 times a year. the Trust Board employs two Managers to run Piringa, they each work 40 hours per week. There are also three volunteer Advisers to the Trust Board.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 6/08/2018 $143,343 $112,410
30/09/2017 24/07/2017 $114,811 $93,967
30/09/2016 11/08/2016 $94,674 $101,776
30/09/2015 17/09/2015 $103,552 $93,200
30/09/2014 17/09/2014 $104,500 $89,695
30/09/2013 25/08/2013 $78,786 $80,420
30/09/2012 3/09/2012 $72,975 $76,716
30/09/2011 1/09/2011 $78,692 $65,713

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Margie Upson Trustee 21/06/2014
David John Allen Trustee 13/02/2011
Gavin William Mcconnell Trustee 20/02/2010
Michael Peter Hughes Trustee 20/02/2010
Michelle Faye Mcconnell Trustee 20/02/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stephanie Maree Cook Trustee 30/04/2014
David John Allen Trustee 13/02/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/07/2014 NOC005
8/11/2011 NOC003
5/04/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents