pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Rangitoto College PTA Charitable Trust
CC29547
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

3 Andara Close
Pinehill
Auckland
0632

Charity's other details

027 2372952


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To establish a trust fund to make grants and / or provide scholarships for the Rangitoto College

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Education / training / research

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Income generated by investments to be applied to funding as decided by trustees

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 4/09/2019 $6,964 $8,029
30/09/2018 7/09/2018 $3,872 $5,026
30/09/2017 12/09/2017 $4,936 $3,016
30/09/2016 30/06/2016 $4,829 $3,005
30/09/2015 31/08/2015 $7,235 $3,005
30/09/2014 23/10/2014 $2,672 $6,021
30/09/2013 16/07/2013 $3,465 $6,079
30/09/2012 8/09/2012 $3,466 $6,079
30/09/2011 21/06/2011 $3,478 $46
30/09/2010 10/08/2010 $7,572 $3,050

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Patrick John Gale Trustee 31/03/2018
Lynda Twidle Trustee 30/04/2014
Nola Kay Real Trustee 16/04/1998
Winston Gordon Davies Trustee 16/04/1998

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Charles Hodge Trustee 3/07/2017
Gabrielle Maria Carman Trustee 30/04/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/05/2016 NOC007
23/10/2014 NOC005
11/07/2013 AR006

Charity Documents