pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Choices New Zealand Limited
CC56492
N/A
Registered

Registration details

18/12/2018
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 10376
The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6143
c-/ Duncan Cotterill
Level 2, 50 Customhouse Quay
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04) 472 2247
(04) 472 0429


Group Members


Below are all the members of IHC New Zealand. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Accessible Properties New Zealand Limited
Choices New Zealand Limited
Idea Services Limited
IHC New Zealand Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The charitable object of IHC New Zealand Incorporated generally, and of Choices New Zealand Limited in particular, is to establish and maintain vocational, residential, recreational and community services for persons with an intellectual disability and their families.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

People with disabilities

Health

Other charities

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

NZ limited company which is a wholly owned subsidiary of IHC New Zealand Incorporated

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ralph Vincent Jones Director 28/09/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/11/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents