pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Ohinetahi Charitable Trust
CC33920
9429043106462
Registered

Registration details

6/11/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 30159
Barrington
Christchurch
8244
31 Governors Bay Teddington Road
RD 1
Governors Bay
8971

Charity's other details

0274726025


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust was established to maintain, preserve and develop the property at Governors Bay known as Ohinetahi and to make it available to the public of New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Heritage property

Arts / culture / heritage

Sport / recreation

General public

Entity Structure

The Trust Deed allows for a board of not less than four nor more than eight trustees whose responsibility is to provide effective governance of the Trust. The Trust employs a manager and staff to maintain and operate the property.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 27/12/2020 $82,529 $486,612
31/12/2019 3/01/2020 $283,610 $284,430
31/12/2018 20/12/2018 $801,785 $235,680
31/12/2017 12/01/2018 $622,837 $223,848
31/12/2016 12/03/2017 $221,134 $220,144
31/12/2015 15/02/2016 $5,101,603 $218,513
31/12/2014 11/12/2014 $2,106,033 $155,577
31/12/2013 19/12/2013 $676,570 $180,463
31/12/2012 3/01/2013 $761,956 $180,746
30/09/2011 21/03/2012 $38,461 $218,680

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Deborah Ann Fahey Trustee 1/07/2018
Robert Tannahill Watson Trustee 1/07/2018
William John Dwyer Trustee 1/07/2018
Jenny Gwynnydd Harper Trustee 25/06/2014
Sarah Louise Astor Trustee 4/07/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alan Trott Trustee 1/07/2018
Ross William Jewell Trustee 1/07/2018
Sir Frederick Miles Warren Trustee 19/03/2018
Ada Pauline Trengrove Trustee 13/10/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/07/2018 NOC007
12/01/2018 NOC005
21/03/2012 AR003
23/09/2011 NOC002
23/09/2011 AR002

Charity Documents