pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Connect The Dots
CC51470
Registered

Registration details

20/03/2015
March 31

Address for service

7 Pacific Street
Waiuku
2123
70 Hill Road
Manurewa
Auckland
2102

Charity's other details

021 990 370
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/Connectthedotscharitabletrust


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

OUR MISSION Connect the Dots Charitable Trust’s mission is to connect people and strengthen neighbourhoods through the creative arts. OUR VISION Connect the Dots believes in the transformative power of the arts. We aim to create opportunities to grow, connect and celebrate the strengths and capabilities of individuals and communities. Connect the Dots envisions neighbourhoods where difference is celebrat

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Facilitation Arts), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development

Older people

Children / young people, Other charities, People with disabilities, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Connect the Dots is an incorporated, charitable trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2017 4/08/2017 $28,456 $38,945
30/09/2016 10/05/2016 $61,857 $36,455
30/09/2015 8/09/2015 $6,881 $6,214

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lincoln Jefferson Board member 22/02/2018
Eimi Tamua Trustee 23/11/2016
Erin Marie McVeigh Trustee 1/09/2016
Priscilla Ann Brown Trustee 1/09/2016
Sarah Margaret Ferens Trustee 1/09/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Julia Craig Trustee 1/05/2018
Judith Darragh Trustee 27/11/2016
Andrea Gaskin Chairperson 6/09/2016
Selina Anderson Chairperson 6/09/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/05/2018 NOC010
13/03/2018 NOC009
14/02/2018 NOC008
2/12/2016 NOC006
23/11/2016 NOC005
23/11/2016 NOC004
17/08/2016 NOC003
6/05/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents