pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Destiny Social Services Trust
CC31078
9429042982081
Deregistered
17/01/2010
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32 (1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005.

Below are details of Destiny Social Services Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
February 28
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 17/01/2010 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32 (1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 51761
Pakuranga
Auckland
2140
18 Allright Place
Mount Wellington
Auckland
1060

Charity's other details

095708773
095708772


Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Employment, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Religious groups


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2009 - - - To be filed To be filed

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Elizabeth Anne Lewis Trustee 1/03/2007
Richard Samuel Lewis Trustee 1/03/2007
Tania Suzanne Pene Trustee 1/03/2007
Dehana Maria Sargeant Trustee 1/01/2004
William Mark Sargeant Trustee 1/01/2004

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents