pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
CNI Tourism Limited
Dart River Safaris Limited
Glacier Southern Lakes Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Hoaka Limited
Hollyford Valley Walk Limited
Hukafalls Jet Limited
MWD Helicopters Limited
Ngai Tahu Aquaculture Services Limited
Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust

Group Details


Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group

Registration details

Registered
1/12/2008
CC35565
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 13046
Armagh
Christchurch
8141
Te Whare o Te Waipounamu
15 Show Place
Addington
Christchurch
8024

Group's other details

03 371 2613
03 341 6792


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 5/12/2018 $446,836,000 $365,327,000
31/12/2017 15/12/2017 $441,237,000 $354,764,000
31/12/2016 22/12/2016 $533,099,000 $361,042,000
31/12/2015 21/12/2015 $410,945,000 $327,813,000
31/12/2014 5/12/2014 $407,768,000 $272,717,000
31/12/2013 20/12/2013 $269,032,000 $215,593,000
31/12/2012 6/12/2012 $260,637,400 $187,022,000
31/12/2011 24/11/2011 $163,642,000 $167,780,000
31/12/2010 13/12/2010 $145,769,000 $123,620,000
31/12/2009 16/12/2009 $165,174,000 $172,985,000

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Refer to the Charitable Trust Deed.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Employment

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Care / protection of animals, Economic development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Other (please state)

(All of the above), Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Children / young people

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/12/2010 AR003
16/12/2009 AR002

Group Documents