pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Downtown Community Ministry Wellington Inc
DCM
CC10890
Registered

Registration details

20/08/2007
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 6133
Marion Square
Wellington
6141
2 Lukes Lane
2 Lukes Lane
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04)3847699
(04)3847688


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Downtown Community Ministry supports people marginalised within Wellington City to assist them access and sustain housing, access Work and Income benefits and sustain their income, provide money management support, assist with basic food needs, provide a supportive gathering space, assist with gaining skills ready for work, and emergency dental treatment.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Employment

General public

Children / young people, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Beneficiaries

Entity Structure

Downtown Community Ministry is an incorporated Society registered under the Incorporated Societies Act 1908.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2017 12/10/2017 $1,046,445 $943,806
31/12/2016 28/11/2016 $767,581 $698,179
31/12/2015 27/11/2015 $687,186 $670,501
31/12/2014 8/01/2015 $632,562 $633,274
31/12/2013 4/12/2013 $665,631 $643,971
31/12/2012 18/12/2012 $670,148 $661,560
31/12/2011 30/11/2011 $671,472 $602,751
31/12/2010 1/12/2010 $623,744 $613,006
31/12/2009 6/01/2010 $597,575 $604,717

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Margaret Smith Board Member 17/10/2016
Michael Harcourt Board Member 17/10/2016
Neavin Broughton Board Member 22/02/2016
Linda Polaschek Board member 1/12/2014
Carol Dale Board member 3/12/2012
Kevin Lampen-Smith Board member 3/12/2012
Wayne Douglas Phillips Board Member 23/11/2009
Richard Thornton Read Board member 3/11/2008
David Zwartz Board Member 16/05/2007
Kevin Francis McCormack Board Chair 16/05/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Julia Mitchell Board member 10/04/2017
Brian Dawson Board member 27/06/2016
Monty Arnott Board Member 20/04/2016
Judith Claire Wishart Board Member 1/04/2013
John Nicholas Jennings Board Member 21/11/2011
Richard William Giese Board Member 1/03/2010
Edith Joan Tyler Board Member 1/11/2009
Jason Darwin Board Member 1/11/2009
Carolyn Mary Goudswaard Board Member 3/11/2008
Iona Katherine Mary Pannett Board Member 12/11/2007

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/10/2016 NOC013
11/10/2016 NOC012
8/01/2015 NOC010
26/11/2013 NOC009
18/12/2012 AR006
16/06/2011 NOC004
1/12/2010 AR004
30/11/2010 NOC002
6/01/2010 AR003
20/11/2008 AR002

Charity Documents