pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Lloyd Morrison Foundation
CC46816
9429043218325
Registered

Registration details

27/07/2011
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
HRL Morrison & Co Foundation 28/07/2011
Lloyd Morrison Foundation 21/07/2015

Address for service

PO Box 10052
The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6143
Level 9
111 The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 9788021


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Lloyd Morrison Foundation was established to support organisations that seek to improve the life of New Zealanders.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research

Health

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Other charities

Children / young people, General public

Entity Structure

The Lloyd Morrison Foundation is an incorporated charitable trust with individual trustees .

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 25/08/2020 $8,075,891 $663,112
30/09/2019 12/08/2019 $1,917,097 $545,121
30/09/2018 31/08/2018 $1,964,103 $588,535
30/09/2017 4/09/2017 $1,420,994 $631,062
30/09/2016 20/10/2016 $3,484,927 $516,069
30/09/2015 5/10/2015 $1,880,927 $3,299
30/09/2014 25/09/2014 $3,000 $3,118
30/09/2013 1/10/2013 $3,000 $3,000
30/09/2012 9/11/2012 $1,500 $1,005

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Janice Margaret Galloway Trustee 19/11/2018
Julie Louise Nevett Trustee 10/09/2011
Liberato Petagna Trustee 4/04/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Marko Bogoievski Trustee 19/11/2018
Susan Michelle Clifford Trustee 19/11/2018
Timothy Ian Brown Trustee 23/06/2015
Lloyd (hugh Richmond) Morrison Trustee 9/02/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/02/2019 NOC009
5/02/2019 NOC008
16/12/2015 NOC004
30/09/2014 NOC003
1/10/2013 AR002
9/11/2012 AR001

Charity Documents