pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Priory In New Zealand of the Most Venerable Order of the Hospital of St John of Jerusalem
St John
CC35053
9429043031801
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 14902
Panmure
Auckland
1741
St John Ambulance Headquarters
2 Harrison Road
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

0800 785 646


Group Members


Below are all the members of St John. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Kaikoura St. John Foundation Trust
Order of St John Great Barrier Island
St John Alexandra Area Committee
St John Ambulance Financial Control Board - Timaru
St John Amuri Area Committee
St John Ashburton Area Committee
St John Banks Peninsula Area Committee
St John Bay Of Islands Area Committee
St John Benneydale Area Committee
The Priory In New Zealand of the Most Venerable Order of the Hospital of St John of Jerusalem

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

St John exists to further the work of The Order of St John and to meet the needs of the community within New Zealand for high quality and readily accessible treatment and services. This includes the provision of a medical alarms service, training and advice in primary healthcare, including accident prevention in the workplace and the home as well as help, advice and training for other health related needs in the community. The mission of St John in New Zealand is to prevent and relieve sickness and injury, and to act to enhance the health and well-being of all people throughout New Zealand. The vision for St John is enhanced health and wellbeing for all New Zealanders.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Education / training / research, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The governing body of St John worldwide is its Grand Council. In New Zealand the Priory Chapter overseas the philosophy of the organisation and approves the strategic and financial direction of St John in New Zealand; recommends change to international policy and provides recommendations on conferring honours and awards. Priory Chapter is chaired by the Governor-General, as Prior of the Order in New Zealand. Priory Chapter is responsible for all the work of St John in New Zealand.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 17/12/2014 $242,046,001 $238,242,000
31/12/2013 13/12/2013 $239,755,000 $232,177,000
31/12/2012 10/01/2013 $237,274,000 $237,200,000
31/12/2011 8/12/2011 $223,169,000 $225,438,000

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Amit Prasad Member 1/10/2020
Deborah Shirley Godinet Member 1/10/2020
Gary William Salmon Member 1/10/2020
Julie Read Member 1/10/2020
Maxine Huirangi Grace Moana-Tuwhangai Member 1/10/2020
Kelvan Smith Member 1/07/2019
John Henry Whitehead Chancellor 1/03/2017
Souella Maria Cumming Deputy Chancellor 22/11/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Grant John Crowley Member 30/09/2020
Julian David Butson Member 30/09/2020
Kenneth Ivan Williamson Trustee 30/09/2020
Peter Young Trustee 30/09/2020
Rachel Hannah Brooke Member 30/09/2020
Steven Alan Evans Chancellor 30/09/2020
Vanessa Jane Thornton Priory Trust Board Member 30/09/2020
Joanne Maree Conroy Trustee 30/06/2019
Geoff Ridley Trustee 22/03/2019
Lesley McTurk Priory Trust Board Member 7/11/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/11/2019 NOC033
8/06/2018 NOC030
30/08/2017 NOC025
16/02/2016 NOC023
2/07/2015 NOC022
13/10/2014 NOC021
3/07/2014 NOC020
23/06/2014 NOC019
13/03/2013 NOC015
15/10/2012 NOC014

Charity Documents