pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Floating Foundation
CC54318
N/A
Registered

Registration details

11/01/2017
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 311
Mangawhai
0540
71A Moir Street
Mangawhai 0505
Takutai Square
Mangawhai
0505

Charity's other details

021 414 762
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/thefloatingfoundation

Oceania

Fiji, Tonga, Vanuatu


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To increase our understanding of the environment through research and to help and empower local communities of the pacific through focused humannity projects

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

The Organisation will be formed as a charitable trust with a board of trustees. The Organisation will be administered by the board, comprising initially of Craig Koning. The Trust Deed for the Organisation states that the board will have no more than 10 trustees (but is expected to have a further three independent trustees). The Organisation is not affiliated with any other Organisation.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2017 16/04/2018 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Craig Koning Trustee 23/12/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gary Richard Paul Board Member 1/01/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/05/2017 NOC002
11/04/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents