pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Hallowed History Charitable Trust Board
CC53568
9429043296040
Registered

Registration details

13/05/2016
March 31

Address for service

41 Walter Road
Lowry Bay
Eastbourne
Lower Hutt
5013

Charity's other details

+64 273169545
Facebook icon image
nil
Twitter icon image
nil
nil

Oceania

Australia

North America

United States

Asia

India, Israel

Europe

United Kingdom


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purposes of the Trust are: (a) to honour, preserve and keep alive the memory and history of military veterans; (b) to raise money to support military veterans, and their families, in need; (c) to educate the general public, especially younger generations, about the sacrifice made by military veterans and the gratitude owed to them by the public; and (d) such other charitable purposes as the Board of Trustees may decide.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Arts / culture / heritage, International activities

Other charities

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Veterans in need

Entity Structure

A single charitable trust with three elected Trustees, those Trustees being a Chairman, a Treasurer and a Trust Secretary.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 26/09/2021 $158 $0
30/09/2020 27/09/2020 $0 $0
30/09/2019 25/09/2019 $0 $0
30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $0 $0
30/09/2017 19/09/2017 $0 $0

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hillsdon Scott McJorrow Chairperson 28/04/2016
John Andrew Campbell Secretary 28/04/2016
John Alan Kettle Treasurer 28/04/2016

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents