pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Foureyes Foundation Limited
Foureyes Foundation
CC53080
9429042160540
Registered

Registration details

5/02/2016
March 31

Address for service

57 Rakau Road
Hataitai
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

+6421938269
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/foureyesfoundation
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/4EyesFoundation
https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=hjznYPCq22E&ab_channel=FoureyesFoundation


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To identify and treat New Zealand children with eyesight problems. Foureyes Foundation works with schools to get glasses to children who need them the most. Glasses can help treat vision problems (ensuring children can readily read school books and whiteboards), and also help with symptoms (e.g. headaches, difficulty concentrating, words becoming mixed up on the page).

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Health, People with disabilities

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Foureyes Foundation Limited is a registered charitable company and a registered charity. Operational decisions are made by the Board of the Foundation which currently has five members. Day to day tasks are carried out by Ravi Dass and Stephanie Hill, the co-founders of the charity. A Donations Deed sets out the relationship between Foureyes Foundation and related company Mr Foureyes (run by Ravi and Stephanie). Mr Foureyes operates a buy one, give one model with sales of optical glasses.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $5,498 $33,031
31/10/2019 31/10/2019 $60,812 $20,756
30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $17,463 $5,533
30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $14,305 $1,727

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kenneth James Wilson Chairperson 3/12/2018
Grant Kenneth Dabb Board member 31/08/2016
Ravi Dass Operations Manager 1/02/2016
Renuka Rao Treasurer 1/02/2016
Stephanie Hill Secretary 1/02/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/11/2020 NOC008
3/12/2018 NOC005
24/05/2017 NOC002
31/08/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents