pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Gift Trust
CC40774
9429043100934
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Prometheus Donor Advised Charitable Giving Trust 11/06/2009
Prometheus Gift Trust 1/04/2010
The Gift Trust 18/03/2015

Registration details

10/06/2009
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 19120
Courtenay Place
Wellington
6149
115 Tory Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 391 4438


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Gift Trust's mission is to help people donate to the charitable causes they care about more easily and efficiently. We do this by providing donor-advised Gift Accounts, allowing donors to grow and manage their charitable donations in a more strategic and thoughtful way.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Community development

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Economic development

General public

Other charities

Entity Structure

The Gift Trust has a governance board of trustees who oversee the strategic direction of The Gift Trust and approve grants. The Gift Trust employ staff to provide management and operations.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 18/05/2018 $1,546,516 $484,082
30/09/2017 8/06/2017 $326,843 $376,060
30/09/2016 3/05/2016 $199,791 $305,231
30/09/2015 2/07/2015 $247,435 $332,284
30/09/2014 22/09/2014 $118,908 $38,243
30/09/2013 19/09/2013 $146,334 $18,386
30/09/2012 20/09/2012 $105,893 $10,490
30/09/2011 23/03/2011 $76,046 $3,771
30/09/2010 5/08/2010 $2 $25,197

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
George David Woods Trustee 16/05/2017
Anake Angus Murray Goodall Trustee 10/05/2016
Philip McKinstry Trustee 9/10/2013
Doris Marianne Zuur Trustee 16/03/2012
Glen Saunders Trustee 2/08/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Susan Barker Trustee 3/01/2016
Susan Patricia Cooper Trustee 2/08/2013
Duncan John Power Trustee 19/12/2011
Noel Josephson Trustee 19/12/2011
Otto Ernest Friedrich Mengedoht Trustee 2/08/2011
Roy Peter Boonen Trustee 16/12/2009
Terry John Creighton Trustee 16/12/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/03/2015 NOC010
4/03/2015 NOC009
10/01/2014 NOC008
18/10/2013 NOC005
19/09/2013 AR005
16/03/2012 NOC004
30/08/2011 NOC003
23/03/2011 AR003
5/08/2010 AR002
26/03/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents