pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Social Service Council of the Diocese of Christchurch
Anglican Care (Canterbury-Westland)
CC27132
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 1032
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140
269 Hereford Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03-5999-090


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects of the Council, also known as Anglican Care (Canterbury/Westland), as set out in the rules of the Council, are to organise, promote, perform and evaluate all forms of Christian social service undertaken by the Agency within the Diocese. The mission of Anglican Care (Canterbury/Westland) is “in Christian love to serve and seek justice in the community”. The vision is that “In Christ, Anglican Care exists to enable every person within the Diocese region of Canterbury/Westland to have the opportunity to take a just, fulfilling and appropriate part in the community according to the resources reasonably available both internal and external.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Social Service Council of the Diocese of Christchurch (also known as Anglican Care (Canterbury /Westland) is constituted and incorporated under the Social Service Council of the Diocese of Christchurch Act 1952. Under Section 4(2) of the Act, the objects of the Council are to perform the work hitherto performed by the Boards dissolved by the Act and in addition any such other charitable work as may come within the scope of the objects of the Council as set out in the rules of the Council (Se

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2018 18/12/2018 $8,312,000 $7,163,000
31/12/2017 13/12/2017 $14,541,000 $13,859,000
31/12/2016 21/12/2016 $14,620,000 $14,842,000
31/12/2015 17/12/2015 $18,009,000 $13,613,000
31/12/2014 30/10/2014 $15,739,000 $14,912,000
31/12/2013 16/12/2013 $28,303,000 $13,815,000
31/12/2012 18/12/2012 $25,370,270 $16,230,960
31/12/2011 16/12/2011 $29,990,112 $24,774,426
31/12/2010 19/12/2010 $15,788,615 $15,223,276

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ben Martin Randall Trust Board Member 1/10/2019
Peter John Beck Trust Board Member 6/09/2019
Peter Ruane Carrell Trust Board Member 9/02/2019
Nalini Barbara Meyer Trust Board Member 2/05/2017
Charles Edward Muir Trust Board Member 2/09/2016
Jane Ellen Evans Trust Board Member 6/10/2015
Neil Maurice Shewan Trust Board Member 2/09/2014
Lorraine Mokahetaue Ritchie Trust Board Member 2/07/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Katrina Mary Hill Trust Board Member 6/09/2019
John Sheldon Shoaf Trust Board Member 5/03/2019
Michael Paul Baker Trust Board Member 4/12/2018
Victoria Matthews Trust Board Member 1/05/2018
Peter Ottrey Williams Trust Board Member 2/05/2017
Gordon Arthur Cockell Trust Board Member 18/10/2016
Brenda Jayne Bonnett Trust Board Member 2/09/2016
Rosalyn Anne Deane Trust Board Member 7/06/2016
Simon Dean Courtney Trust Board Member 1/03/2016
Geoffrey John Stephen Hayhoe Trust Board Member 19/08/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/11/2019 NOC034
21/10/2019 NOC033
3/05/2019 NOC032
3/04/2019 NOC031
3/08/2017 NOC028
2/06/2017 NOC027
2/12/2016 NOC025
2/12/2016 NOC024
2/12/2016 NOC023
2/12/2016 NOC022

Charity Documents