pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wilderland Trust
Wilderland
CC29221
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

2486 Tairua Whitianga Road
RD 1
Whitianga
3591
155 Comers Road
RD 1
Whitianga
3591

Charity's other details

078663848
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/WilderlandTrust/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Wilderland Trust operates 64 ha of land in the Coromandel Peninsula as an organic farm and open space where students come to learn about, and develop, sustainable living systems, food production methods and ecosystem management processes. We aim to provide the facilities and space for all people to come and engage together in the whole education and development of people, building better societies through experiential learning.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Health, Environment / conservation, Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

The trust consists presently of six trustees, a combination of resident managers on the land and external trustees. The resident trustees function as a link to the long-term participant group who operate the land, farm, and business as volunteers on behalf of the trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2016 31/12/2016 $156,531 $125,991
31/12/2015 14/12/2015 $141,611 $108,308
31/12/2014 22/12/2014 $143,414 $106,366
31/12/2013 18/11/2013 $93,824 $87,074
31/12/2012 30/12/2012 $81,385 $72,228
31/12/2011 17/12/2011 $72,065 $67,323
31/12/2010 7/04/2011 $71,294 $84,203
31/12/2009 21/08/2009 $71,590 $75,135

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Clio Meyer Trustee 19/03/2018
Warren Grant Stutt Trustee 10/12/2017
Jonah Marinovich Chairperson 15/06/2017
Kennedy Tyler Baird Treasurer 23/02/2015
Peter Johnston Secretary 27/12/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jessica Holdaway Trustee 19/03/2018
Lihi Shaky Trustee 4/12/2017
Simeon McLean Trustee 27/03/2017
Shay Brod Trustee 23/01/2017
Joshua Mainwaring Trustee 8/02/2016
Lihi Shaky Treasurer 21/12/2015
Roger Harwood Trustee 7/06/2015
Russel Mooyman Chairman 23/02/2015
Faith Thomas Trustee 9/12/2013
Jessica Holdaway Trustee 7/08/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/12/2011 NOC010
3/08/2011 NOC009
26/06/2011 NOC008
7/04/2011 AR004
7/10/2010 NOC007
11/06/2010 NOC006
20/05/2010 NOC005
29/01/2010 NOC004
21/08/2009 AR003
30/06/2009 NOC003

Charity Documents