pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wilderland Trust
Wilderland
CC29221
9429042919001
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

2486 Tairua Whitianga Road
RD 1
Whitianga
3591
155 Comers Road
RD 1
Whitianga
3591

Charity's other details

078663848
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/WilderlandTrust/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Wilderland Trust operates 64 ha of land in the Coromandel Peninsula as an organic farm and open space where students come to learn about, and develop, sustainable living systems, food production methods and ecosystem management processes. We aim to provide the facilities and space for all people to come and engage together in the whole education and development of people, building better societies through experiential learning.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Health, Environment / conservation, Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

The trust consists presently of five trustees, a combination of resident managers on the land and external trustees. The resident trustees function as a link to the long-term participant group who operate the land, farm, and business as volunteers on behalf of the trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2019 29/11/2019 $86,183 $74,003
31/12/2018 19/01/2019 $93,869 $80,717
31/12/2017 19/01/2019 $86,944 $84,242
31/12/2016 31/12/2016 $156,531 $125,991
31/12/2015 14/12/2015 $141,611 $108,308
31/12/2014 22/12/2014 $143,414 $106,366
31/12/2013 18/11/2013 $93,824 $87,074
31/12/2012 30/12/2012 $81,385 $72,228
31/12/2011 17/12/2011 $72,065 $67,323

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Daniel Vasku Treasurer 7/02/2020
Jonathan Boulle Secretary 7/02/2020
Sara Farnsworth Trustee 7/02/2020
Kenneth Andre Wakefield Trustee 20/01/2020
Aidan Kao Chairperson 16/09/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Katie Pickering Trustee 29/05/2020
Jonah Marinovich Trustee 11/02/2020
Levi Boffa-Martin Trustee 11/02/2020
Peter Johnston Secretary 7/02/2020
Thomas Dale Cardwell Trustee 7/02/2020
Warren Grant Stutt Treasurer 7/02/2020
Clio Meyer Trustee 16/09/2019
Jess Purvis Trustee 11/03/2019
Kennedy Tyler Baird Trustee 11/03/2019
Jessica Holdaway Trustee 19/03/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/05/2020 NOC041
12/02/2020 NOC040
10/02/2020 NOC039
23/01/2020 NOC038
18/09/2019 NOC036
13/03/2019 NOC035
29/08/2018 NOC032
1/08/2018 NOC031
29/03/2018 NOC030
29/03/2018 NOC029

Charity Documents