pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Equal Employment Opportunities Trust
EEO Trust, Diversity Works New Zealand
CC22630
9429042699866
Registered

Registration details

7/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 12929
Penrose
Auckland
1642
Level 1
90 Symonds Street
Grafton
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

095253023
095257076
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/diversityworksnz/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/diversityworks_
https://www.linkedin.com/company/diversityworksnz/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The EEO Trust is a not-for-profit organisation tasked with providing Equal Employment Opportunities information and tools to employers, raising awareness of diversity issues in New Zealand workplaces. We assist employers in introducing and managing proven EEO thinking and practices; encourage diversity by promoting the recruitment and development of people on the basis of merit and generate awareness of the business benefits and rewards of an inclusive workplace. Based in Auckland, the EEO Trust works with employers around New Zealand providing the latest resources, ideas and information to support workplaces to achieve success through effectively managing diversity.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Education / training / research

Employment

Other (please state)

(Employees/Employers), Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

We are governed by a member elected Board of Trustees consisting of public and private sector representation. Lead by a Chief Executive, a team of four full time and two part time staff. This small team works with a team of facilitators, matter experts and dedicated consultants and suppliers to provide the services that support workplaces to achieve effective workplace diversity.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2018 20/11/2018 $1,325,780 $1,120,710
31/12/2017 4/12/2017 $1,066,828 $1,181,988
31/12/2016 30/11/2016 $1,049,509 $1,163,769
31/12/2015 26/01/2016 $1,111,324 $1,217,406
31/12/2014 10/12/2014 $1,075,932 $1,139,495
31/12/2013 29/11/2013 $1,022,819 $978,940
31/12/2012 27/11/2012 $1,054,393 $1,296,022
31/12/2011 18/11/2011 $1,477,026 $1,456,489
31/12/2010 1/12/2010 $1,388,755 $1,386,726

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Susan Doughty Trustee (Co-opted) 1/06/2018
Adrienne Miller Trustee 24/08/2017
John Christie Trustee 24/08/2017
Ranjna Patel Trustee 24/08/2017
Debbie Power Trustee 4/05/2017
Naomi Ferguson Trustee 4/05/2017
Michael Frances Barnett Chairman 26/01/2017
Chris Litchfield Trustee 28/05/2015
Helene Quilter Trustee 12/09/2011
Michelle Hippolite Trustee 12/09/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kylie Mooney Trustee 31/05/2018
Sue Foley Trustee 25/01/2017
Michael Barnett Trustee 4/11/2016
Neil Porteous Trustee 10/03/2016
Jo Wills Trustee 11/05/2015
Belinda Clark Trustee 30/11/2014
Felicity Evans Trustee 30/11/2014
Kate Daly Trustee 30/11/2014
Marie Shroff Trustee 30/11/2014
Peter Hughes Trustee 30/11/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/01/2019 NOC023
19/06/2018 NOC021
29/03/2018 NOC020
29/03/2018 NOC019
8/11/2017 NOC017
21/09/2017 NOC016
29/08/2017 NOC015
9/11/2016 NOC013
7/05/2015 NOC012
11/12/2014 NOC011

Charity Documents