pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Destiny Church Whangarei
CC31001
9429042998723
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
February 28

Address for service

PO Box 1941
Whangarei
140
97 Western Hills Drive
Kensington
Whangarei
0112

Charity's other details

094595651
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/DestinyChurchWhangarei/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote and make provision for the social, psychological, physical, emotional and spiritual needs of the community and to provide family and community recreation within a christian environment. To establish anywhere in NZ venues that will provide for the social and religious development of people in that community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The charity has five appointed trustees which have governance over the entity. The charity employs 1 Full time Staff member in a clerical position and 1 Part time position which is held by the Pastor. All other services and support is added by over 50+ volunteers.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2018 2/09/2018 $254,268 $213,268
31/08/2017 31/08/2017 $155,324 $159,697
31/08/2016 28/08/2016 $172,786 $139,060
31/08/2015 27/08/2015 $148,305 $137,397
31/08/2014 2/10/2014 $145,418 $135,050
31/08/2013 31/08/2013 $154,855 $156,110
31/08/2012 31/08/2012 $196,732 $203,117
31/08/2011 29/08/2011 $218,617 $219,454
31/08/2010 30/08/2010 $210,599 $224,739
31/08/2009 31/08/2009 $248,677 $287,443

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joel Luke de Vetter Trustee 6/04/2018
Bryce Kaneri Manuel Murray Trustee 2/06/2013
Kiona Faye Johnson Trustee 2/06/2013
Robert Alan Johnson Trustee 2/06/2013
Hannah Radclavina Huirangi Tamaki Trustee 1/04/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Vincent Warren Kask Trustee 24/08/2017
Derek Hohepa Tait Trustee 2/06/2013
Jennifer Louise Marshall Trustee 2/06/2013
Marina Edna Tait Trustee 2/06/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/06/2013 NOC003
7/09/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents