pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St John Of God Hauora Trust
CC25633
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
St John Of God Health And Disability Services 10/06/2008
St John Of God Hauora Trust 9/07/2008

Registration details

9/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

189 Peterborough Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details

03 3391790
03 338 2008


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

St John of God Hauora Trust is a provider of health and social services to vulnerable young people and parents, as well as people living with disability in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provision of services to the disabled

People with disabilities

Accommodation / housing, Health, Social services

People with disabilities

Children / young people

Entity Structure

We provide life-enhancing services to people living with a physical or neurological disability in a range of locations in New Zealand through our Health and Ability Services Division. Our Community Youth and Child Services Division deliver an innovative range of programmes at St John of God Waipuna providing young people, their families/whanau and the community with support and opportunities for development.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 27/09/2018 $15,313,375 $14,928,299
31/12/2017 21/09/2017 $13,919,939 $13,650,061
31/12/2016 30/10/2016 $15,126,559 $13,553,053
31/12/2015 2/11/2015 $13,196,959 $13,309,134
31/12/2014 21/12/2014 $12,379,087 $12,301,977
31/12/2013 13/12/2013 $12,656,602 $12,322,026
31/12/2012 29/11/2012 $11,242,503 $11,919,623
31/12/2011 5/05/2011 $11,099,484 $10,967,707
31/12/2010 31/12/2010 $8,955,742 $8,868,358
31/12/2009 6/04/2010 $6,728,148 $6,523,020

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter William Jensen Trustee 1/04/2018
Kevin Taylor Trustee 1/03/2017
TIMOTHY JOHN BURNS Trustee 1/07/2016
Kathryn Dalziel Trustee 1/07/2010
Marion Cowden Trustee 1/07/2010
Bevan Killick Chair 1/08/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tracey Burton Trustee 28/02/2017
Sarah Mather Trustee 31/12/2016
Moana Ohinerangi Trustee 30/06/2016
Pauline Sheila Barnett Trustee 30/06/2016
Bevan Killick Chair 30/04/2015
Bevan Killic Trustee 29/04/2015
Bryan Pyne Trustee 28/10/2014
Garry John Donnithorne Trustee 30/10/2013
Stephen Roberts Trustee 30/06/2012
Patricia Gay Wood Trustee 26/10/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/04/2015 NOC011
7/01/2014 NOC010
29/11/2012 AR005
3/09/2012 NOC006
5/05/2011 AR004
31/12/2010 AR003
27/09/2010 NOC005
6/04/2010 AR002
15/12/2009 NOC004
19/08/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents