pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Good Programmes Trust
GoodYarn
CC55540
9429046522818
Registered

Registration details

16/07/2018
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 172
Gore
9740
15A Hokonui Drive
Gore
9710

Charity's other details

0212347413


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Trust will be to educate and train people throughout New Zealand to improve mental health literacy. The Trust will: 3.1 deliver GoodYarn Facilitator training; 3.2 support Facilitators to deliver GoodYarn workshops; 3.3 work with organisations to create and embed mentally healthy work practices; and 3.4 provide ongoing support and evaluation of the GoodYarn programme consistent with this charitable purpose.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

We are a Trust that has formed to govern the GoodYarn Programme, a mental health literacy programme. The Trust employs or contracts staff to administer, develop and manage the programme. We currently have four trustees on the governance board including executive positions of Chair, Treasurer and Secretary.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 14/09/2019 $116,600 $83,353

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dana Christine Carver Trustee 19/01/2018
Katie Phillipa Dunn Trustee 19/01/2018
Lindsay Gordon Wright Trustee 19/01/2018
Terrance John Buckingham Trustee 19/01/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Louise Joy Thompson Trustee 13/08/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/01/2019 NOC005
23/01/2019 NOC004
23/01/2019 NOC003
17/01/2019 NOC002

Charity Documents