pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Project Lyttelton Incorporated
Project Port Lyttelton Incorporated
CC26725
9429042809371
Registered

Registration details

26/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 74
Lyttelton
8841
54A Oxford Street
Lyttelton 8082
Lyttelton
8082

Charity's other details

(03)328 9243
Facebook icon image
LOVE LYTTELTON


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Maintain and improve the quality of life of the inhabitants of Lyttelton. Portal to Canterbury's historic past, a vibrant sustainable community creating a living future.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The Society ID governed by a Board consisting of a Chair,Secretary, Treasurer and up to 9 other community members. People who are passionate about the Lyttelton community form the board. Below the board is a series of advisory groups made up of people who are passionate about the project they are supporting. These groups steer the direction of each project and then the board ensures we have resources to to support and administer the various projects the community wishes to develop.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/10/2020 28/10/2020 $340,046 $331,106
30/09/2019 13/08/2019 $357,385 $368,314
30/09/2018 4/09/2018 $312,302 $294,440
30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $264,161 $271,972
30/09/2016 13/09/2016 $377,490 $372,660
30/09/2015 10/08/2015 $387,868 $406,100
30/09/2014 15/09/2014 $454,771 $462,174
30/09/2013 6/09/2013 $342,535 $369,151
30/09/2012 31/07/2012 $323,301 $319,922

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alister George Brown Treasurer 8/10/2020
Jacinda Gilligan Board member 8/10/2020
Rebecca Kathryn Jenkins Board Member 8/10/2020
Anne Mackay Board Member 11/07/2019
Jacqueline Anne Newbound Manager 11/07/2019
John Steven Allen Secretary 11/07/2019
Sarah Carvell Van der Burch Chair 12/07/2018
Gillian Taylor Board Member 27/07/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stewart Henry Treasurer 8/04/2021
Jillian Susan Larking Board Member 11/02/2021
Margaret Jefferies Chair 31/12/2020
Chantal Jousserand-Shirley Secretary 11/07/2019
Joshua David Fedder Board Member 11/07/2019
Wendy Everingham Treasurer 11/07/2019
Trevor Best Manager 31/12/2018
Jill Larking Board Mmeber 12/07/2018
Lucette Hindin Manager 12/06/2018
Ruth Louise Targus Board Member 27/07/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/07/2019 NOC017
5/09/2018 NOC015
6/09/2017 NOC013
10/08/2015 NOC011
15/09/2014 NOC010
6/09/2013 AR006
6/11/2012 NOC005
31/07/2012 AR005
30/08/2011 NOC004
21/07/2010 AR003

Charity Documents