pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Royal Society of New Zealand Wellington Branch Incorporated
RSNZ Wellington Branch
CC42176
9429042739012
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
August 31

Address for service

PO Box 3085
Wellington
6140
C/- ROYAL SOCIETY OF NZ
11 Turnbull Street
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

+64 273922358
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/RSNZWellington/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/RSNZWellington


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects of the Royal Society of New Zealand Wellington Branch Inc. are the promotion and advancement of science, technology and the humanities in the Wellington region.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, International activities, Economic development, People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The Royal Society of New Zealand Wellington Branch Inc. is an incorporate society and charitable trust registered with the New Zealand Companies Office and the Charities Commission. The society operates under a Constitution and is governed by the requirements by the Incorporated Society Act 1908 and the Charitable Trusts Act 1957.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 28 February 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 28 February 2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
28/02/2021 7/12/2020 $1,167 $704
29/02/2020 30/10/2019 $3,125 $1,448
28/02/2019 24/10/2018 $1,998 $3,724
28/02/2018 2/11/2017 $2,490 $3,847
28/02/2017 3/11/2016 $3,246 $3,873
29/02/2016 27/10/2015 $5,716 $5,792
28/02/2015 7/12/2014 $2,431 $7,200
28/02/2014 4/12/2014 $2,247 $7,439
28/02/2013 19/01/2015 $5,683 $5,436
29/02/2012 1/03/2012 $8,283 $2,824

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jessica Maree Cockburn Council member 2/12/2020
Evan Crofford Brenton-Rule Council Member 21/10/2020
James Johnston Bass Council Member 21/10/2020
William Jalal Vandenberg Gracie Secretary 9/10/2019
Lucy Forde Council Member 20/10/2016
Brian Jones Treasurer 26/11/2014
Frank Andrews council member 31/08/2011
David Alexander Lillis President 24/10/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nicole Maree Jones President 21/10/2020
Phil Lester Council Member 21/10/2020
Chrissy Boulton Secretary 9/10/2019
Charles Richard William Beasley Council member 11/10/2018
Jay Christopher Curtis Treasurer 1/02/2018
Arthur Wynyard Beasley Council Member 10/10/2017
Nancy Yopp Council Member 10/10/2017
Trevor Drage Council Member 10/10/2017
Queenie Lin Treasurer 30/06/2017
Nicole Jones Secretary 20/10/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/01/2015 NOC005
4/12/2014 NOC004
1/03/2012 AR004
4/03/2011 AR003

Charity Documents