pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


World Vision of New Zealand Trust Board
CC25984
9429042923046
Registered

Registration details

16/06/2008
September 30

Address for service

Private Bag 92078
Victoria Street West
Auckland
1142
51 Hugo Johnston Drive
Penrose
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

09 580 7700
09 580 7799
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/search/top/?q=world%20vision

Oceania

Papua New Guinea, Solomon Islands, Vanuatu

Africa

Malawi, Mali, Niger, Tanzania, Uganda, Zambia

Asia

Bangladesh, Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, India, Vietnam


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

World Vision New Zealand is a Christian relief, development and advocacy organisation dedicated to working with children, families and communities to overcome poverty and justice.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Child Focussed Community Development), Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

International activities

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Religious activities, Economic development, Fund-raising

Children / young people

Other charities, General public

Entity Structure

The World Vision of New Zealand Trust Board is a charitable trust established in October 1974. It is registered under the Charities Act 2005. World Vision International ("WVI") is an international affiliation with offices in over 100 countries. WVI assists World Vision New Zealand by facilitating the coordination, implementation and monitoring of overseas programmes to ensure the funds provided by donors are used to directly benefit people in need and especially address the needs of the child.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 March 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 March 2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2021 12/01/2021 $70,051,000 $70,051,000
31/03/2020 18/12/2019 $67,454,000 $67,454,000
31/03/2019 17/12/2018 $68,908,000 $68,908,000
31/03/2018 19/02/2018 $66,763,000 $66,763,000
31/03/2017 17/02/2017 $73,257,000 $73,257,000
31/03/2016 23/12/2015 $68,103,178 $68,103,178
31/03/2015 14/01/2015 $56,989,598 $56,989,598
31/03/2014 22/04/2014 $51,969,436 $51,969,436
31/03/2013 16/04/2013 $54,869,308 $54,711,546
31/03/2012 9/11/2011 $55,717,000 $52,864,000

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Charles Badenoch Trustee 18/07/2019
Jean Michel Patrice De Marigny Trustee 1/05/2019
Michael Ian Duncan Trustee 3/03/2019
Patrick Edward Brockie Trustee 3/03/2019
Matthew Patrick Prichard Trustee 25/02/2018
Kym Samuels Trustee 18/07/2017
Toni Laming Trustee 19/02/2017
Margie Apa Trustee 27/01/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Peter John Wilson McClure Trustee 11/11/2019
Darryl James Gardiner Trustee 1/05/2019
Jonathan Peter Hartley Trustee 1/05/2019
Andrew Winton Picot Trustee 30/11/2018
Abraham Gibson Trustee 25/09/2017
Donna Louise Shepherd Trustee 19/02/2017
Bonnie Wurzbacher Trustee 17/02/2017
Sandy Callister Trustee 25/11/2016
Fiona Whyte Member of the Board of Trustees 26/09/2016
Elizabeth Ann Smythe Trustee 31/12/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/12/2019 NOC033
18/07/2019 NOC032
27/02/2019 NOC030
6/07/2018 NOC028
22/03/2018 NOC027
4/10/2017 NOC023
19/07/2017 NOC022
19/04/2017 NOC021
8/03/2017 NOC019
18/01/2017 NOC017

Charity Documents