pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


World Vision of New Zealand Trust Board
CC25984
Registered

Registration details

17/06/2008
September 30

Address for service

Private Bag 92078
Victoria Street West
Auckland
1142
51 Hugo Johnston Drive
Penrose
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

09 580 7700
09 580 7799
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/search/top/?q=world%20vision

Oceania

Papua New Guinea, Solomon Islands, Vanuatu

Africa

Malawi, Mali, Niger, Tanzania, Zambia

South America

Colombia

Asia

Bangladesh, Cambodia, India, Vietnam

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

World Vision New Zealand is a Christian relief, development and advocacy organisation dedicated to working with children, families and communities to overcome poverty and justice.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Child Focussed Community Development), Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

International activities

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Religious activities, Economic development, Fund-raising

Children / young people

Other charities, General public

Entity Structure

The World Vision of New Zealand Trust Board is a charitable trust established in October 1974. It is registered under the Charities Act 2005. World Vision International ("WVI") is an international affiliation with offices in 97 countries. WVI assists World Vision New Zealand by facilitating the coordination, implementation and monitoring of overseas programmes to ensure the funds provided by donors are used to directly benefit people in need and especially address the needs of the child.

Annual Returns


Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 March 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 March 2010.

Date Submitted For Year Ended Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/02/2017 30/09/2016 $73,257,000 $73,257,000
23/12/2015 30/09/2015 $68,103,178 $68,103,178
14/01/2015 30/09/2014 $56,989,598 $56,989,598
22/04/2014 30/09/2013 $51,969,436 $51,969,436
16/04/2013 30/09/2012 $54,869,308 $54,711,546
9/11/2011 30/09/2011 $55,717,000 $52,864,000
11/03/2011 30/09/2010 $60,608,000 $61,127,000
12/03/2010 30/09/2009 $61,831,000 $61,429,000
11/05/2009 30/09/2008 $58,246,345 $62,876,128

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Abraham Gibson Trustee 23/02/2015
Margie Apa Trustee 27/01/2011
Darryl James Gardiner Trustee 4/06/2010
Andrew Winton Picot Trustee 26/01/2010
Jonathan Peter Hartley Trustee 31/01/2008
Peter John Wilson McClure Trustee 20/02/2004

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Donna Louise Shepherd Trustee 19/02/2017
Bonnie Wurzbacher Trustee 17/02/2017
Sandy Callister Trustee 25/11/2016
Fiona Whyte Member of the Board of Trustees 26/09/2016
Elizabeth Ann Smythe Trustee 31/12/2013
Natalie Nicole Archer Trustee 31/12/2012
Frances Mary Ricketts Trustee 31/07/2010
Robert Arthur Robinson Trustee 31/03/2010
Mark Gilmour Brunton Trustee 26/01/2010
David Raymond Simpson Trustee 1/03/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/12/2013 NOC013
30/05/2013 NOC008
10/05/2012 NOC009
10/08/2011 NOC007
11/10/2010 NOC006
5/08/2010 NOC005
12/03/2010 NOC004
23/02/2010 NOC003
11/05/2009 AR002
25/11/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents