pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Balmoral School PTA
CC28054
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

19 Brixton Road
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024

Charity's other details

0221283498


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To bridge a link between the young people, the home, the parents, the School and the Board of Trustees To provide the social side of the running of the School To have fun as parents and teachers together in social activities, demonstrations and or guest speakers To help raise funds to provide better facilities and opportunities for the whole school community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Registered Charity.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2019 17/03/2019 $121,872 $75,607
30/06/2018 16/03/2018 $184,547 $81,317
30/06/2017 15/03/2017 $175,411 $187,474
30/06/2016 3/05/2016 $256,607 $218,513
30/06/2015 18/05/2015 $131,929 $101,233
30/06/2014 28/04/2014 $190,195 $194,516
30/06/2013 3/05/2013 $234,058 $229,803
30/06/2012 24/04/2012 $192,454 $201,441
30/06/2011 5/04/2011 $179,799 $174,521
30/06/2010 17/05/2010 $136,667 $135,231

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sarah Gaskell Treasurer 14/03/2017
Tracy Peirce Treasurer 14/03/2017
Kristen de Monchy Chairperson 30/03/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ann Marie Worth Treasurer 14/03/2017
Debbie Campbell Secretary 14/03/2017
Claude Galpin Chairperson 30/03/2016
Denise Smith Secretary 30/03/2016
Jo Somerville Leadership Team 18/05/2015
Mel Hargreaves Leadership Team 18/05/2015
Michelle Keats Secretary 18/05/2015
Janine Claire Bliss Treasurer 25/03/2014
Hannah Peddie Leadership Team 25/03/2013
Jo Kayes Leadership Team 25/03/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/05/2016 NOC010
14/04/2016 NOC009
18/05/2015 NOC008
28/04/2014 NOC007
24/08/2012 NOC003
24/04/2012 AR005
27/08/2009 AR002
4/05/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents