pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Institute for World Evangelisation - ICPE Mission (New Zealand Branch)
ICPE Mission
CC26004
9429042664345
Registered

Registration details

16/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

75 Hawker Street
Mount Victoria
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 801 7797
Facebook icon image
ICPE Mission New Zealand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Institute for World Evangelisation - ICPE Mission is a Catholic Mission made up of Christians committed to the goal of world evangelisation. The ICPE Mission is dedicated to the formation and training of Catholics so that they may become more effective evangelisers. Through evangelisation, discipleship, community building and mercy work, the ICPE Mission pursues its purpose of training, formation, serving the Church and affecting the world for Christ. The ICPE Mission is an International Association of Christ's faithful with Pontifical Right and is the missionary expression of the Glory of God International Covenant Community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Religious groups

Children / young people, Prisoners

Entity Structure

The governance of the Trust is the Board of Trustees. For the daily operations of the Trust a Director is appointed for a term of three years and the term is renewable.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2019 - - - - To be filed
31/08/2018 25/08/2018 $199,449 $209,807
30/06/2017 2/03/2018 $319,411 $237,424
30/06/2016 26/04/2017 $364,325 $286,694
30/06/2015 3/09/2015 $216,290 $247,342
30/06/2014 19/09/2014 $296,556 $249,604
30/06/2013 10/06/2013 $288,294 $242,324
30/06/2012 29/06/2012 $247,312 $234,088
30/06/2011 30/06/2011 $192,629 $200,652
30/06/2010 30/06/2010 $144,000 $128,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Wimpie Santoso Trustee 22/07/2010
Charles Hannaford Trustee 1/02/1997
Fritz Mascarenhas Trustee 1/02/1997
Mark Dol Trustee 1/02/1997
Rainer Hensel Trustee 1/02/1997
Silvana Abela Trustee 1/02/1997
Anna Cappello Trustee 1/08/1990
Mario Cappello Trustee 1/08/1990

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Richard Luxford Trustee 31/12/2009
Edgard Nikolaus Wirtz Trustee 6/11/2008
Joachim Swienter Trustee 6/11/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/04/2017 NOC006
10/06/2013 AR006
30/06/2011 AR004
30/06/2010 AR003
12/06/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents