pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Accessible Properties New Zealand Limited
CC44506
9429031543453
Registered

Registration details

23/06/2010
June 30

Address for service

c/- Duncan Cotterill
PO Box 10376
The Terrace
Wellington
6143
c/- Duncan Cotterill, Level 2
50 Customhouse Quay
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 471 9438


Group Members


Below are all the members of IHC New Zealand. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Accessible Properties New Zealand Limited
Choices New Zealand Limited
Idea Services Limited
IHC New Zealand Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The provision of social rental housing and affordable rental housing to persons in need.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Accommodation / housing

Social services, Employment, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

New Zealand limited company which is a wholly owned subsidiary of IHC New Zealand Incorporated

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 20/12/2016 $7,837,000 $5,819,000
31/12/2015 11/12/2015 $13,814,000 $4,223,000
31/12/2014 27/01/2015 $10,491,000 $2,338,000
31/12/2013 9/01/2014 $6,001,000 $1,718,000
31/12/2012 14/01/2013 $4,035,000 $1,129,000
31/12/2011 13/09/2011 $1,272,000 $983,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Vicki Susan Buck Director 18/09/2018
Christopher Martin Udale Director 31/05/2018
Andrew Hardwick Evans Director 23/05/2017
Neil Taylor Director 1/08/2014
Donald Hewitt Thompson Director 4/06/2010
Ralph Vincent Jones Director 4/06/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Paul Adams Director 30/08/2018
Graeme Horsley Director 21/04/2018
Gregory Orchard Director 8/01/2017
John Falloon Director 2/07/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/01/2019 NOC015
26/09/2018 NOC014
11/09/2018 NOC013
30/08/2018 NOC012
10/05/2018 NOC011
9/05/2018 NOC010
11/09/2017 NOC009
23/05/2017 NOC008
10/08/2016 NOC006
18/02/2015 NOC004

Charity Documents