pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The New Zealand Baptist Missionary Society
Tranzsend
CC22737
9429042679332
Registered

Registration details

8/04/2008
August 31

Address for service

PO Box 12149
Penrose
Auckland
1642
473 Great South Road
Penrose
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

(09) 526 8444
(09) 526 8445
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/NZBMS

Oceania

Papua New Guinea

Asia

Bangladesh, Thailand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The general object of the Society is to enable Churches of the Baptist Union of Churches in New Zealand to fulfill the "Great Commission" of the Lord Jesus Christ in those areas of the world to which He may direct. The Society currently has mission personnel in South, South East and East Asia. The NZBMS is an incorporated society under the Incorporated Society Act 1908.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Religious activities

General public

Religious groups

Entity Structure

Our constitution states that the Society’s Council shall consist of, the President, Vice-President, National Leader of the Baptist Union and Missionary Society, and the General Director of the Society, the National President of the New Zealand Baptist Missionary Fellowship, up to eight members to be elected by the Annual Meeting. In addition to the above, there may be up to three co-opted members each year.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 28/02/09 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 28/02/10.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
28/02/2019 - - - - To be filed
28/02/2018 4/04/2018 $3,008,669 $3,312,717
28/02/2017 28/02/2017 $2,276,754 $2,257,438
29/02/2016 29/02/2016 $2,453,888 $2,453,888
28/02/2015 16/02/2015 $2,375,655 $2,374,157
28/02/2014 26/02/2014 $3,175,009 $3,174,976
28/02/2013 25/03/2013 $2,839,374 $2,839,374
29/02/2012 13/02/2012 $2,840,837 $2,840,837
28/02/2011 23/02/2011 $2,768,809 $2,768,809
28/02/2010 26/01/2010 $2,224,384 $2,129,670

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Beulah Wood Council Member 11/11/2017
Josephine Te Kahu Ex Oficio Member 28/02/2017
Edmonds Namburi Council Member 4/11/2016
Andrew Page Tranzsend Team Leader 1/04/2016
Lynette Davis Council Member 15/11/2014
Rachel Murray General Director 1/04/2014
Rewai Te Kahu Council Member 8/11/2013
Nigel Cottle Council Member 15/11/2012
Craig Vernall Ex Oficio Member 11/11/2011
David Auty Council Member 11/11/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Peter James Patrick Ex Oficio Member 11/11/2017
Benjamin Wakefield Ex-officio Member 4/11/2017
George Wieland Council Member 4/11/2017
Gregory Knowles Council Member 4/11/2017
Margaret Sim Ex-officio Member 4/11/2016
John Douglas Council Member 6/11/2015
John Mcmullan Officer 6/11/2015
Neil Perry Council Member 6/11/2015
Rachel Murray Council Member 6/11/2015
Brian Kenning Council Member 15/11/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/01/2017 NOC011
29/02/2016 NOC010
16/02/2015 NOC009
26/02/2014 NOC007
7/01/2014 NOC006
22/03/2013 AR005
13/02/2012 AR004
23/02/2011 AR003
26/01/2010 AR002
27/11/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents