pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Johnsonville Community Association Incorporated
previously Johnsonville Progressive Association
CC49844
9429043320752
Registered

Registration details

22/10/2013
March 31

Address for service

10 Birch Street
Johnsonville
Wellington
6037

Charity's other details

027 444 1748
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/jvilleca/
www.neighbourly.co.nz/organisation/jca-johnsonville-community-association-inc


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Support and promote local community interests for the public benefit of all residents of Johnsonville and Raroa, including working with the Wellington City Council and other organisations such as GWRC and NZTA and other community groups as appropriate. These local community interests include: the maintenance and improvement of safe and reliable public services including transport, protection of the local environment, enhanced recreational facilities, and connecting residents and improving appreciation of our cultural diversity, community well-being, and the mutual sharing of resources.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Facilitates community engagement), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Community development

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development

Other (please state)

(Residents of Johnsonville and Raroa, residents includes groups, businesses, schools, churches, clubs and similar organisations operating within the area as well as individuals.)

Entity Structure

All residents (including groups such as businesses, schools, churches, clubs) within the boundaries of Johnsonville & Raroa are automatically "ordinary" members of JCA. Members may become "voting" members, with the right to one vote at any meeting of the Association, by paying a gold coin donation. The President, Vice President, Honorary Secretary & Honorary Treasurer are elected for a 1 year term at the AGM. The Association holds monthly meetings from February to November each year.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 6/08/2018 $1,043 $129
30/09/2017 15/09/2017 $26 $3,660
30/09/2016 24/09/2016 $4,929 $3,351
30/09/2015 16/09/2015 $14,236 $9,773
30/09/2014 21/09/2014 $13,455 $14,895

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Darren John Bottin Vice President 27/06/2018
Larraine Helen Talbot Honorary Treasurer 27/06/2018
Graeme Sawyer Immediate Past President 26/07/2017
Simon Pleasants President 26/07/2017
Maureen Sullivan Honorary Secretary 30/07/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mark Spiers Treasurer 27/06/2018
Peter Sullivan Vice President 27/06/2018
Graeme Sawyer President 26/07/2017
Debbie Player Vice President 29/07/2015
Graeme Sawyer Hon Treasurer 30/07/2014
Rob Austin Vice President 30/07/2014
Tony Randle President 30/07/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/09/2017 NOC005
23/08/2015 NOC002
21/09/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents