pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


National Assistance Fund
CC37140
9429045525049
Registered

Registration details

15/08/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 4361
Kamo
Whangarei
0141
46 Church Road
Pukete
Hamilton
3200

Charity's other details

094354280


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Mission is to source and apply resources for the benefit and well being of persons in NZ through promoting the understanding and practice of the Christian faith, including advancing education and relief of poverty, and to assist in the effective operation of charitable organisations. We contribute to the well-being of NZ society by supporting the provision of:  Educational facilities operated on principles consistent with the Christian faith.  Relief for persons in poverty or necessitous circumstances.  Facilities and services for care of the elderly.  Facilities for Christian worship  Medical care and emergency response.  Services to assist legal compliance by charities and the effective use of charitable resources.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Make Donations

Education / training / research

Accommodation / housing, Emergency / disaster relief, Religious activities, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Relief of Poverty

Other charities

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

NAF has a corporate trustee, NAF Trustee Ltd, with a Board of five Directors.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

Issued an exemption to the requirement to prepare financial statements which comply with tier 1 of the financial reporting standards for the financial year ending 30 June 2017. Refer to letter issued under documents

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2020 10/06/2020 $15,933,879 $14,974,589
31/12/2019 17/12/2019 $62,701,298 $29,992,588
31/12/2018 10/12/2018 $26,125,619 $28,473,025
31/12/2017 19/12/2017 $32,523,076 $30,771,922
31/12/2016 24/01/2017 $31,355,813 $30,222,338
31/12/2015 13/01/2016 $41,243,226 $28,324,152
31/12/2014 18/12/2014 $30,119,141 $29,643,333
31/12/2013 19/12/2013 $26,308,621 $26,067,823
31/12/2012 31/12/2012 $26,840,026 $27,055,151

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 6 months from 1 July 2019 to 31 December 2019.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
NAF Trustee Ltd Trustee 29/06/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
NAF Limited Trustee 29/06/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/12/2019 NOC013
4/07/2016 NOC008
4/07/2016 NOC007
31/12/2012 AR004
11/11/2010 NOC004
10/11/2010 NOC003
31/03/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents