pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


University of Canterbury Students Association Incorporated
UCSA
CC10045
Registered

Registration details

8/03/2007
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 31311
Ilam
Christchurch
8444
90 Ilam Road
Ilam
Christchurch
8041

Charity's other details

(03)364 2652
(03)364 2670
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/theUCSA
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/ucsa


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation

Children / young people

Entity Structure

The Association is a diverse organization that owns a 50% share of the University Book Shop and operates a number of facilities around the campus, including childcare centres.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
University Bookshop (Canterbury) Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 11/05/2018 $15,472,161 $12,391,042
30/06/2017 22/05/2017 $11,346,891 $11,748,626
30/06/2016 13/06/2016 $15,514,252 $10,612,088
30/06/2015 30/06/2015 $8,690,036 $9,253,851
30/06/2014 30/06/2014 $6,712,758 $6,926,473
30/06/2013 28/06/2013 $5,508,588 $6,320,351
30/06/2012 20/08/2012 $6,969,204 $6,754,259
30/06/2011 29/07/2011 $8,286,059 $8,367,436
30/06/2010 17/05/2010 $8,538,357 $8,753,977
30/06/2009 21/05/2009 $8,317,025 $8,020,292

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alexander Holmes General Executive 1/01/2018
Devanshi Gandhi General Executive 1/01/2018
Emma McCone General Executive 1/01/2018
Joshua Proctor President 1/01/2018
Julia Rolleston General Executive 1/01/2018
Laura O'Dwyer General Executive 1/01/2018
Laura Robinson Vice President 1/01/2018
Liam Donnelly General Executive 1/01/2018
Sam Brosnahan Finance Officer 1/01/2018
Shayne Goldingham General Executive 1/01/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Chanuka Da Silva General Executive 31/12/2017
Emily Barker Vice President 31/12/2017
Hannah Mereraiha White Te Akatoki (Maori Representative) - General Executive 31/12/2017
James Addington President 2016 - 2017 31/12/2017
Joshua Proctor Finance Officer 31/12/2017
Laura Robinson General Executive 31/12/2017
Riley Brosnahan General Executive 31/12/2017
Ron (Seong Su) Park General Executive 31/12/2017
Sam Brosnahan General Executive 31/12/2017
Thomas Gillman General Executive 31/12/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/10/2010 NOC008
16/02/2010 NOC007
22/05/2009 NOC006
21/05/2009 AR004
16/02/2009 NOC005
18/11/2008 NOC004
5/06/2008 NOC003
27/05/2008 AR003
16/05/2008 AR002
2/03/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents