pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Humanity Collective Charitable Trust
CC55570
N/A
Registered

Registration details

10/04/2018
March 31

Address for service

54 Philomel Crescent
Bayswater
Auckland
0622

Charity's other details

027 4466640
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/thehumanitycollective/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The vision for the Humanity Collective is to create a vibrant space that promotes sustainable living in an inclusive way. Our mission is to encourage a wide range of people to integrate sustainable choices and practices in their daily lives. Our strategic focus is on sharing knowledge through interaction and collaboration in a central location. We host and coordinate inspiring talks, hands-on educational events, cultural activities and performances, and community markets.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

The Humanity Collective operates as a Charitable Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gary Paul Fitzpatrick Trustee 13/03/2018
Zella Morrison Trustee 28/02/2018
Karen Marie Francis Trustee 27/02/2018
Kelly Leah Francis Trustee 27/02/2018

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents