pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Celtic Flute School of New Zealand Incorporated
Ceol Aneas
CC53335
Registered

Registration details

6/05/2016
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 66
Raglan
3265
13 Wallis Street
Raglan 3225
The Wood
Raglan
3225

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote Celtic music in New Zealand through education, performance and participation.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Runs a music school

Education / training / research

Community development, Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Musicians Irish interest

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 16/06/2018 $26,250 $29,560
30/06/2017 27/06/2017 $20,494 $19,714

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kara Dawson Secretary 5/06/2016
Chih Tham Committee Member 31/05/2015
Helen Lindsay Committee Member 31/05/2015
Ian Douglas Makinson Committee Member 31/05/2015
Lynne Wilkins Treasurer 31/05/2015
Michael MacKinnon Committee Member 31/05/2015
Theodore Cizadlo Chairperson 31/05/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jeanette Ware Committee Member 3/06/2018
Andy Linton Committee Member 4/06/2017
Brendyn Montgomery Committee Member 4/06/2017
Kathryn McDonald Committee Member 5/06/2016
Nigel Robertson Committee Member 5/06/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/06/2018 NOC004
16/06/2018 NOC003
31/05/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents