pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


C.L.C Auckland Trust Board
LIFE
CC22520
9429042613817
Registered

Registration details

3/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 108138
Symonds Street
Auckland
1150
14 Normanby Road
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024

Charity's other details

(09)3064222
(09)3064223


Group Members


Below are all the members of C.L.C Auckland Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Business Life Investment Fund Limited
C.L.C Auckland Trust Board
Life Business Investment Trust
Life Child Care Centre Limited
LIFE Leadership College Limited
LIFE North Trust
LIFE Publishing Limited
LIFE Venues Limited
Quality Education Services Limited
The Life Centre Trust Auckland

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The church is a charitable organisation seeking to provide a place of Christian worship, teaching, assistance and care. LIFE is dedicated to bringing hope, help and personal growth to people through being active in the Christian faith. LIFE is committed to the promotion of the Christian belief and to helping the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Community development, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

A Charitable Trust – a not-for-profit organisation governed by its board of Trustees.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Business Life Investment Fund Limited CC31870
Life Business Investment Trust CC51334
Life Child Care Centre Limited CC36850
LIFE Leadership College Limited CC45391
LIFE North Trust CC45784
LIFE Publishing Limited CC46503
LIFE Venues Limited CC36873
Quality Education Services Limited CC56380
The Life Centre Trust Auckland CC22609

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 29/11/2019 $29,048,195 $25,992,298
31/12/2018 14/12/2018 $25,367,112 $20,138,050
31/12/2017 10/12/2017 $32,626,991 $29,665,780
31/12/2016 29/06/2017 $53,269,508 $27,279,981
31/12/2015 18/12/2015 $14,800,690 $14,020,924
31/12/2014 19/12/2014 $15,473,237 $14,596,917
31/12/2013 23/12/2013 $12,282,079 $12,361,116
31/12/2012 21/12/2012 $12,193,705 $12,244,034
31/12/2011 23/11/2011 $11,901,557 $10,795,444

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 18 months from 1 July 2019 to 31 December 2020.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Luke de Jong Trustee 4/09/2019
Simon Manners Trustee 4/09/2019
Paul Fredrick Schnell Trustee 22/05/2015
Earl Gasparich Trustee 30/06/2007
Paul de Jong Trustee 11/05/1992

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Maree de Jong Trustee 4/09/2019
Barry Thom Trustee 29/05/2019
Joel Holm Trustee 22/05/2015
Janice Barbara Yaxley Trustee 11/02/2012
Trevor Frederick Yaxley Trustee 11/02/2012
David Jesze Trustee 16/03/2011
Hannah Elizabeth Wood Trustee 21/06/2010
Mark Richard Sewell Trustee 21/06/2010
Marshall Gray Trustee 21/06/2010
Sandra Innes Trustee 21/06/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/08/2020 NOC016
29/06/2020 NOC015
18/12/2015 NOC010
1/03/2012 NOC006
31/03/2011 NOC005
22/07/2010 NOC004
29/01/2010 NOC003
8/01/2010 AR003
31/12/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents