pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tertiary Students Christian Fellowship NZ Incorporated
TSCF
CC23673
9429043100347
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Tertiary Students Christian Fellowship (NZ) 1/05/2008
Tertiary Students Christian Fellowship NZ Incorporated 18/03/2009

Registration details

30/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 9672
Marion Square
Wellington
6141
9a Oxford Terrace
Mount Cook
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

(04) 384 7274

Oceania

Fiji

South America

Ecuador

Europe

Italy


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Tertiary Students Christian Fellowship’s vision is to help thousands of students become servant leaders of character through the transforming gospel of Christ. Following personal conversion and guided by biblical wisdom, they will integrate faith, study, work and life, and bring cultural renewal to New Zealand’s tertiary institutions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Education / training / research, International activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people

Entity Structure

TSCF is an incorporated society with membership made of staff and volunteers, governed by a board and managed by a staff team.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/06/2018 25/06/2018 $1,958,922 $1,926,589
30/06/2017 21/09/2017 $1,940,146 $1,919,493
30/06/2016 15/08/2016 $1,742,881 $1,827,644
30/06/2015 22/07/2015 $1,780,608 $1,657,341
30/06/2014 17/06/2014 $1,577,557 $1,620,173
30/06/2013 4/06/2013 $1,578,754 $1,624,199
30/06/2012 1/06/2012 $1,597,000 $1,817,000
30/06/2011 30/05/2011 $1,929,000 $1,450,000
30/06/2010 23/06/2010 $1,375,000 $1,366,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Benjamin Carswell National Director 1/01/2019
Andrew Becroft Chairperson 1/05/2008
Dennis Fountain Vice-Chair 1/05/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nigel Pollock National Director 31/12/2018
Ian Purdy Treasurer 1/07/2014
Christopher Clarke President 31/03/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/02/2019 NOC015
12/09/2017 NOC012
28/05/2015 NOC011
29/07/2013 NOC006
24/06/2013 NOC005
21/05/2013 AR006
8/05/2013 NOC004
23/06/2010 AR003
24/04/2009 NOC003

Charity Documents